U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50182
  • Case Name: David Chris Soenksen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Case Closed Without a Discharge]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Text Order)]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Debtors Only)]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.