U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flying Bye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Request]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.