U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30024
  • Case Name: Leah Rae Spiel and Bryan Keith Spiel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compel (do not use for abandonments)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Status Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule J]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule I]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule H]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule G]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule E/F]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule D]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule C]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule A/B]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.