U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-10005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Twin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 20, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.