U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merrival
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • February 16, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 11, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating SR / Probation]
  • February 11, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 23, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 15, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 07, 2020: [Furlough]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 17, 2020: [Furlough]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 16, 2020: [Furlough]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 01, 2020: [Furlough]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 11, 2020: [Furlough]
  • September 11, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 02, 2020: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • September 02, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 30, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 07, 2019: [Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 21, 2019: [Furlough]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 01, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 03, 2019: [Furlough]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 13, 2019: [Furlough]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Furlough]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 16, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 29, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Request]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 31, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 28, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.