U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cr-50009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Featherman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Request]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.