U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05061
  • Case Name: Chute v. Viken et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 22, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 06, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • November 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 05, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • July 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 31, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.