U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04011
  • Case Name: Social Security Administration v. Buol
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • August 30, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 01, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 31, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.