U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-03022
  • Case Name: Bell v. Leigh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Registration for Electronic Notice (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 11, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 11, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 02, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • August 02, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Transmittal of Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.