U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-05006
  • Case Name: Allred v. Schaffer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • June 06, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • August 02, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.