U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • January 03, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Verdict]
  • January 03, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • January 03, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 03, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 02, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 02, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 02, 2018: [Jury List]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 27, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 15, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [In Limine]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 14, 2017: [Request]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 03, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.