U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40354
  • Case Name: Joe Dennis Sysel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Venue Change]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.