U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 06-50236
  • Case Name: Allan Joseph Blanchard and Cynthia Lynn Blanchard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Closing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Support Document]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Set Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Response]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (no fee)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lovald, John S. [Reopen Case (no fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.