U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50186
  • Case Name: Six A Corporation
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Modified Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Sample Ballot Form]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.