U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Request for Warrant]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 12, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 07, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2017: [Request]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.