U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 23, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.