U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janisch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 19, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 26, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 27, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • September 25, 2019: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 12, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Competency Report]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Competency Evaluation]
  • January 23, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 26, 2017: [Extend]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Response]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.