U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leon-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 22, 2017: [Response]
  • August 21, 2017: [Request]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.