U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leemhuis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 20, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 18, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 12, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2018: [Arrest]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Response]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2017: [Request]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 22, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.