U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pablo-Tol
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 10, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Response]
  • August 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2017: [Request]
  • August 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.