U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Toj
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 24, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 11, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.