U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hubbs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 19, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2018: [For Order]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 18, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 09, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.