U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 12, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Order]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 23, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 20, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 26, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 19, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Verdict]
  • April 18, 2018: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • April 18, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 16, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 16, 2018: [Jury List]
  • April 16, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 13, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 06, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 06, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2018: [Case Reopened]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 23, 2018: [Witness List]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 19, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 19, 2018: [Response]
  • March 16, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 14, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • March 14, 2018: [Indictment]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response]
  • March 09, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 28, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 26, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 03, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • November 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 10, 2017: [Produce ]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2017: [Response]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 09, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 09, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.