U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-30094-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Fast Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 28, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.