U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40372
  • Case Name: Myron John Boyda
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2018
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.