U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04012
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Teoli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 17, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Returned Mail]
  • October 11, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 11, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 07, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • October 03, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Returned Mail]
September, 2017
  • September 16, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • August 14, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.