U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keskin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 15, 2017: [Request]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.