U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-30110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Rope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.