U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conquering Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 09, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 16, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • October 19, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Verdict]
  • October 19, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 17, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 16, 2018: [Jury List]
  • October 16, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 15, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 15, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 12, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 10, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 09, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 09, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 05, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 05, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 14, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 16, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 07, 2018: [Witness List]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Response]
  • May 29, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2018: [Suppress]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 22, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2017: [Request]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 13, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.