U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 11, 2018: [Request]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2018: [Request]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 16, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 13, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 10, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Furlough]
  • May 09, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 07, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 11, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 10, 2017: [Request]
  • September 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2017: [Request]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 05, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.