U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mednansky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 30, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • September 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 24, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • September 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 12, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Request]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2017: [Request]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.