U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2017: [Request]
  • August 22, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Request]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.