U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 28, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2017: [Request]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Request]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.