U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeGuzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 03, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 22, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Status Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Competency Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Delivered]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 29, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • August 25, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Request]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 21, 2017: [Request]
  • August 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.