U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 05, 2017: [Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Response]
  • August 24, 2017: [Request]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.