U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 16, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 14, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 02, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 17, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 26, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 05, 2017: [Request]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.