U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Byington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 18, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 17, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 04, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2018: [Request]
  • April 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.