U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Leary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Certificate]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 12, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Release from Custody]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
  • September 05, 2017: [Request]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Request]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.