U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Rope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 11, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 13, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2017: [Request]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.