U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCloskey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • June 13, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 26, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 01, 2017: [Request]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Request]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.