U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 17, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 17, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 04, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 17, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 14, 2018: [Ex Parte Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2018: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • August 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 23, 2018: [Case Reopened]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 22, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2018: [Restitution Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 21, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • February 05, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 31, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2018: [Request]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 19, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 17, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • November 13, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 21, 2017: [Request]
  • August 18, 2017: [Request]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Request]
  • August 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.