U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chasing Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 18, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 28, 2017: [Request]
  • August 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2017: [Request]
  • August 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.