U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Afrank
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 07, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 21, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2018: [Consent]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.