U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aschwege
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 08, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 08, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 02, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 02, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 19, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 01, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 18, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.