U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bender
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 14, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 09, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 23, 2021: [Response]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 09, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • March 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • March 26, 2021: [Admission]
  • March 22, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Furlough]
  • May 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Ex Parte Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 28, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.