U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wasner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 10, 2024: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 16, 2017: [Request]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.