U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 27, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Certificate]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 16, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 14, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 10, 2019: [Response]
  • January 08, 2019: [Text Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.