U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dahlquist
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.