U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Custodio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: [Furlough]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 22, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 22, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Request]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.