U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loafer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 25, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.